HI HB1205 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - (S) Referred to TIA/WAM, JGO.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - (S) Referred to TIA/WAM, JGO.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendments to the Hawaii Constitution to expressly provide that the legislature may authorize the counties to issue tax increment bonds. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB1205 HD1)
Title
Tax Increment Bonds; Constitutional Amendment
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to TIA/WAM, JGO. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 166). | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment is sent to the Governor by the House. | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Bertram, Finnegan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 665-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-25 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-10 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 280-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Mizuno, Morita. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-22-10 2:00 pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |