HI HB1189 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1189

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of transportation, in collaboration with the department of health, to establish covid-19 testing sites and conduct rapid testing at all airports operated by the department of transportation with flights arriving from the continental United States and internationally. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Coronavirus Testing At Airports.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-04HouseRe-referred to PDP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6
2021-02-01HouseReferred to PDP/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1189 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Re-referred to PDP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback