HI HB1188 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1188
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a one-year exemption to any business demonstrating they were dependent on county, state, or federal funding to sustain them during state mandated closures. Business may only qualify for this exemption once.
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-04 | House | Re-referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1188 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Re-referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1188&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1188_.HTM |