HI HB1187 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the liquor tax rates. Establishes a general excise tax exemption for wholesalers on the sale of liquor subject to the liquor tax. Reduces the liquor tax rate on beer for small breweries or brewpubs. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB1187 HD1)
Title
Liquor Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 499) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Brower, Evans, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana, Hashem, Marumoto, Pine; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 02-15-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |