HI HB1179 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1179
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance coverage for various sexual and reproductive health care services.
Title
Relating To Health Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1179 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB893 (Same As) 2023-01-31 - Re-Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.
SB893 (Same As) 2023-01-31 - Re-Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1179&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB1179_.HTM |