HI HB1175 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1175
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the micro enterprise assistance program on Hawaiian home lands revolving fund to provide grants and loans through the implementation of the micro enterprise assistance program to qualified native Hawaiians, native Hawaiian-controlled homestead associations, and homestead association community development corporations. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The Community-based Economic Development Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-05-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to ECD, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1175 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Micro Enterprise Assistance Program on Hawaiian Home Lands Revolving Fund
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Micro Enterprise Assistance Program on Hawaiian Home Lands Revolving Fund
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1175&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1175_.HTM |