HI HB1170 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Act 220, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1322).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Act 220, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1322).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises statutory provisions relating to the regulation of geothermal and mineral resources under chapters 171 and 182, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to provide clarity and consistency. (SD2)
Title
Board of Land and Natural Resources; Mineral Resources; Geothermal Resources
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | Senate | Act 220, 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1322). |
2016-07-08 | House | Act 220, on 07/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1322). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2016-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2016-04-29 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee will have decision making on Thursday 04-28-16 11:00AM in Conference Room 224. |
2016-04-21 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Gabbard, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Rhoads Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, Pouha. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 512) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3491) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, Kim, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-31-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from TRE/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3126) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, English, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to TRE/WLA, JDL. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 9). |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-02-08 | House | Deferred one day 02-09-16. |
2016-02-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 02-08-16. |
2016-02-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 50-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-01-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Woodson, McDermott. |
2016-01-28 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-28-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-01-22 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-28-16 2:00PM. |
2016-01-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 252) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-09-15 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |