HI HB117 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB117

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Regulates the purchase of catalytic converters and catalytic converter metals by scrap dealers. Requires a written statement, photograph of the catalytic converter or catalytic converter metals, and verification of a seller's identification prior to a scrap dealer's purchase of a catalytic converter or catalytic converter metals. Specifies recordkeeping requirements for the sale of a catalytic converter or catalytic converter metals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Scrap Dealers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB117 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback