HI HB117 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB117

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Defers further implementation of the executive and judicial branch salary increases that are scheduled for July 1, 2020, as well as planned raises for members of the legislature scheduled for January 1, 2021. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To State Funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2020-05-21HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen excused (2).
2020-05-21HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2020-05-21SenateReceived notice of House intent to agree (Hse. Com. No. 360)
2020-05-18HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 528) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-05-18SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House.
2020-05-15Senate48 Hrs. Notice 05-18-20.
2020-05-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2020-05-15SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3499) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-05-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto.
2020-05-13SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 05-14-20 11:10AM in conference room Auditorium.
2020-05-11SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 05-13-20 10:25AM in conference room Auditorium.
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:35AM in conference room 211.
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 144).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 924), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 2
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-17HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB117 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback