HI HB1166 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, McDermott, Ohno, Souki, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adds the mouth and nose of a family or household member to the types of body parts on which pressure that is applied to intentionally or knowingly impede normal breathing or blood circulation shall constitute abuse of a family or household member as a class C felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family or Household Member Abuse; Body Parts; Abuse; Class C Felony

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-29HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, McDermott, Ohno, Souki, Woodson excused (6).
2016-01-29HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2016-01-21HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, McDermott.
2016-01-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-21-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2015-12-17 Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
2015-02-02HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet {refsheetno}
2015-01-29HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2015-01-28HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB574 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback