HI HB1158 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1158
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to allow its lease with the U.S. Department of the Army to expire on its agreed upon termination date and to not terminate the agreement prior to that date.
Title
Relating To Airfields.
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Val Okimoto [R] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1158 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1158&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1158_.HTM |