HI HB1151 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1151
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to adopt rules pursuant to Chapter 91, HRS, to require certain safety measures for commercial ocean operators that take customers into state waters for activities such as snorkeling, scuba diving, kayaking, and surfing lessons. (HB1151 HD1)
Title
Relating To Commercial Ocean Recreation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 102). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 919), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 606) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 02-01-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1151 (Carry Over) 2019-03-15 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.