HI HB1149 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reorganizes and integrates the land use commission within a modified office of planning, which is renamed as the office of planning and sustainable development. Reclassifies the coastal zone management program and statewide sustainability branch as divisions within the office of planning and sustainable development. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Land Use.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
2021-02-17HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 332) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, McDermott.
2021-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback