HI HB1143 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the definition of "lead agency" and provides that no other agency shall approve an action until the lead agency has accepted a final environmental impact statement.
Title
Environmental Impact Statement; Lead Agency
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB205 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to GVO/ENE.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1143&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB1143_.HTM |