HI HB1140 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 120, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 120, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a temporary income tax credit for the cost of upgrading or converting a qualified cesspool to a septic system or an aerobic treatment unit system, or connecting to a sewer system. Permits DOH, as a pilot program, to certify no more than 2 residential large capacity cesspools as qualified cesspools. Defines terms. Effective 7/1/2015. Sunsets 12/31/2020. (CD1)
Title
Income Tax Credit; Cesspool Upgrade, Conversion, or Connection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Act 120, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220). |
2015-06-16 | House | Act 120, on 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) McKelvey, Morikawa, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Jordan, LoPresti, Onishi, Oshiro, Say voting no (7) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 59). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 59) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Keohokalole, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 11:01AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-27-15 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 11:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Ihara. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Keohokalole, Thielen. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 602) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1519) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-07-15 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1013) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 107). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Onishi voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 699), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 530) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-10-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-28 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1272 (Same As) 2015-02-27 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.