HI HB114 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB114
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that boards subject to the open meetings law shall allow oral testimony on any agenda item at the beginning of the board's agenda or meeting, provided that oral testimony shall not be limited to the beginning of a board's agenda. Specifies an exception for the legislative body of each county.
Title
Relating To Public Testimony At Open Meetings.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB233 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB114 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
HB114 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=114&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB114_.HTM |