HI HB1134 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes references from the public land development corporation to the public private partnership corporation. Adds two non-voting members to the board of directors. Amends the process and requirements for the development and implementation of development plans. Revises the corporation's investment and financing authority. Requires the corporation to comply with chapters 6E, 92, 104, 343, and 444, HRS; sections 10-3.5 and 171-64.7, HRS; and native Hawaiian gathering rights. Requires coordination with the Hawaii Community Development Authority and the Land Use Commission where appropriate. Revises the corporation's reporting requirements. Requires the Public Land Development Corporation to initiate a pilot project after the adoption of rules. Prohibits the Public Land Development Corporation from planning, developing or implementing any projects other than the pilot project until the pilot project has been completed. Requires the Public Land Development Corporation to include a report on the status of the pilot project in its annual report and requires the Public Land Development Corporation to provide a report to the governor and legislature evaluating the pilot project upon its completion. Pilot project repeals on 1/1/16.
Title
Public Land Development Corporation; Public-Private Partnership Corporation; Public Lands; Development Plans and Projects; Investments; Financing; Land Use Commission; Hawaii Community Development Authority; Land Use; Historic Preservation; Ceded Land; Pilot Project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-11-13 1:30PM in conference room 309. |
2013-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on WAL/FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-13. |
2013-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/FIN on Saturday, 02-09-13 9:00AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2013-02-05 | House | Re-referred to WAL/FIN, referral sheet 14 |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1134&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1134_.HTM |