HI HB1133 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Act 038, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals chapter 171C, HRS, relating to the PLDC. Transfers PLDC assets to the DLNR. Deposits funds appropriated to the DLNR pursuant to Act 55, SLH 2011, into the land conservation fund. Deposits proceeds in the stadium facilities special fund and the school facilities special fund into the general fund. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Land Development Corporation; Repeal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateAct 038, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
2013-04-23HouseAct 038, on 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 698).
2013-04-15HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-04-15HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Oshiro, Takai excused (3).
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of House agreement (Hse. Com. No. 649)
2013-04-11HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 558) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-04SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1279) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2013-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-13 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:05AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-03-22SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2013-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 1:20PM in conference room 225.
2013-02-28SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2013-02-15SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-02-15SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 20).
2013-02-14HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-02-13HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
2013-02-13HouseReported from WAL/FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 412), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-11HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-02-11HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
2013-02-09HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-11-13 1:30PM in conference room 309.
2013-02-09HouseThe committee(s) on WAL/FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-13.
2013-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL/FIN on Saturday, 02-09-13 9:00AM in conference room Auditorium.
2013-01-28HouseReferred to WAL/FIN, referral sheet 6
2013-01-24HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-23HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback