HI HB1130 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Act 076, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Act 076, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Public Safety to administer lie detector and psychological tests to determine the suitability of candidates for corrections employment. (HB1130 CD1)
Title
Relating To Employment Practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Act 076, 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177). |
2017-07-06 | House | Act 076, on 07/03/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 26). |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 26) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, San Buenaventura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2017-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-17 11:10AM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; L. Thielen, Taniguchi Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, San Buenaventura, LoPresti Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 634) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1467) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1041) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-17 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 321). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1031) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakashima, McDermott. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-01-17 12:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 252), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB996 (Same As) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).