HI HB1120 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1120
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the Board of Land and Natural Resources discretion to grant easements for less than fair market value for structures that were authorized by a governmental authority and located landward of the shoreline within the record boundary of the property at the time of construction, but are now located seaward of the valid certified shoreline on public land.
Title
Relating To Special Shoreline Encroachment Easements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-03-17 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB986 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to WTL/JDC, WAM.
HB1120 (Carry Over) 2017-02-03 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1120 (Carry Over) 2017-02-03 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1120&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1120_.HTM |