HI HB1116 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes licensure requirements for school psychologists to be administered by the board of psychology. Requires all school psychologists to be licensed by 7/1/2025. Increases the composition of the board of psychology to include two school psychologists. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To School Psychology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-07 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 88) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1116 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB958 (Same As) 2023-01-31 - Re-Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.
SB958 (Same As) 2023-01-31 - Re-Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.