HI HB1115 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1115
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the tuition residency rules for the University of Hawaii to grant the resident tuition fee for enrollment at any University of Hawaii campus to individuals who have graduated from a Hawaii high school and are enrolling in an undergraduate degree program, under certain conditions.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Resident Tuition Fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1115 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB1413 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
SB1413 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1115&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB1115_.HTM |