HI HB1113 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires federal waiver to be sought and cost study to be conducted regarding the inclusion of the cardholder's photo on electronic benefits transfer cards. Requires the cardholder whose electronic benefits card lacks a photo to present a photo identification for certain transactions. Effective July 1, 2013.
Title
Electronic Benefits Transfer Card; Photo Identification
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-12-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1113&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1113_.HTM |