HI HB1103 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation to provide funds for the Department of Human Resources Development to pay claims required by Hawaii's Workers' Compensation Law. (HB1103 HD1)
Title
Making An Emergency Appropriation To The Department Of Human Resources Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 4). |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 688) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1103 (Carry Over) 2017-03-02 - Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 4).
SB969 (Same As) 2017-05-23 - Act 020, on 05/18/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
SB969 (Same As) 2017-05-23 - Act 020, on 05/18/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).