HI HB1093 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1093
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Lowers the required blood quantum to one thirty-second Hawaiian for the lessee's relatives currently eligible to succeed to a lease with one-quarter Hawaiian including a lessee's husband, wife, children, grandchildren, brothers, or sisters.
Title
Relating To The Qualification Of Successors To Lessees Under The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act, 1920, As Amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB959 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to HWN, JDC.
HB1093 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB1093 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1093&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1093_.HTM |