HI HB109 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-08 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-08 - (S) Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the participation by two or more members of a public policy deliberative body: (1) In a public gathering or community event not tied to matters currently under official deliberation or pending action; and (2) In professional association conferences and professional development activities with a publicly accessible report of their activities. Effective January 7, 2050. (HB109 HD1)
Title
Public Agencies; Sunshine Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 21). | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen excused (9). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Takai excused (2). | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 606) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Morita. | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-01-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |