HI HB1088 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts affordable housing units, additions to existing dwelling units, accessory dwelling units, ohana dwelling units, housing developed by the Hawaii Public Housing Authority, and certain housing units developed by self-help housing nonprofit organizations from school impact fee requirements. (HB1088 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To School Impact Fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-07HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 143) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE.
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Aquino, Hashem, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashimoto, Woodson; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HSG, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback