HI HB1085 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (H) Act 073, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

This measure amends chapter 329, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to bring the Hawaii statutes on controlled substances to be consistent with the federal laws on controlled substances, and increases the fee for the registration certificate for qualifying patients for medical marijuana. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB1085 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Controlled Substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-06 (H) Act 073, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
2011-06-06 (S) Act 073, 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
2011-05-06 (H) Transmitted to Governor.
2011-05-05 (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702).
2011-05-04 (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694).
2011-05-03 (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2011-05-03 (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Marumoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2).
2011-04-29 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11.
2011-04-29 (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 88).
2011-04-29 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11.
2011-04-29 (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 88) as amended in (CD 1).
2011-04-28 (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2011-04-28 (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Keith-Agaran, Cullen, Yamane, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2011-04-27 (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 9:00PM in conference room 325.
2011-04-25 (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-11 3:30PM in conference room 325.
2011-04-21 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 662).
2011-04-21 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Shimabukuro.
2011-04-18 (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584).
2011-04-15 (H) House conferees appointed: Aquino, Keith-Agaran, Cullen Co-Chairs; Yamane, Fontaine.
2011-04-15 (H) Re-referred to PBM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 58
2011-04-15 (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573).
2011-04-14 (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2011-04-12 (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 551) in amended form (SD 2).
2011-04-12 (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2011-04-08 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11.
2011-04-08 (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1175) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2011-04-01 (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English.
2011-03-28 (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2011-03-24 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2011-03-24 (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 912) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2011-03-22 (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2011-03-21 (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-22-11 10:30AM in conference room 016.
2011-03-17 (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 8:30AM in conference room 016.
2011-03-10 (S) Referred to JDL, WAM.
2011-03-10 (S) Passed First Reading.
2011-03-10 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 254).
2011-03-08 (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2011-03-04 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11.
2011-03-04 (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 805) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2011-03-03 (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Marumoto.
2011-02-25 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-03-11 2:30PM in House conference room 329.
2011-02-18 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
2011-02-18 (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 554) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2011-02-17 (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Souki.
2011-02-15 (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-17-11 9:00AM in conference room 309.
2011-02-03 (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
2011-01-31 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 02-03-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309.
2011-01-26 (H) Referred to PBM, JUD, referral sheet 2
2011-01-26 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2011-01-24 (H) Pending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1312 (Same As) 2011-01-26 - (S) Referred to WLH.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback