HI HB1080 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1080
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify the group of professionals who are prohibited from knowingly referring or transferring patients to an uncertified or unlicensed care facility, and repeal the landlord exclusion.
Title
Relating To Unlicensed Care Homes.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1080 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
SB1378 (Same As) 2023-07-07 - Act 255, 07/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
SB1378 (Same As) 2023-07-07 - Act 255, 07/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1080&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB1080_.HTM |