HI HB1078 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1078
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-23 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-23 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to department of budget and finance for collective bargaining cost items related to the transition of the operation of Maui regional hospitals to Maui Health Systems, a Kaiser Hospital.
Title
Making An Appropriation For Collective Bargaining Cost Items Related To The Transition Of Maui Region Hospitals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 412), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1078 (Carry Over) 2017-02-23 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB944 (Same As) 2017-04-18 - Re-Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM.
SB944 (Same As) 2017-04-18 - Re-Referred to JDL/CPH, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1078&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB1078_.HTM |