HI HB1076 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1076
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Re-referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-02 - Re-referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans the sale of flavored tobacco products and mislabeled e-liquid products. Appropriates funds. Repeals certain provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes relating to the sale of tobacco products. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | Re-referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT/JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1076 (Carry Over) 2023-02-02 - Re-referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
SB1374 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.
SB1374 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1076&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB1076_.HTM |