HI HB1068 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1068
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Public Housing Authority public housing tenant upward mobility pilot program. Provides part-time on-the-job training to attain minimum qualifications needed for future part-time and full-time employment. Effective upon its approval.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Public Housing Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1366 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1068 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1068 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1068&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1068_.HTM |