HI HB1053 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1053
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to PDP/GVR, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to PDP/GVR, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 103D-307, Hawaii Revised Statutes, Emergency Procurements, to add equipment failures, repairs to public property to protect against further loss of, or damage to, public property, to prevent or minimize serious disruption in continued functioning of government services. Replaces Chief Procurement Officer approval with an accounting report to the Legislature within sixty days after the end of the fiscal year in which the procurement was made.
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to PDP/GVR, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1053 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PDP/GVR, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB1207 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to PDP/GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
SB1207 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to PDP/GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1053&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1053_.HTM |