HI HB1052 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1052
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a five-mile airport hazard area for prevention of potentially hazardous conditions that may be caused by certain land uses or actions. Requires state and county agencies to coordinate land uses and permit approvals with the Hawaii Department of Transportation for land located in the airport hazard area.
Title
Relating To The Airport Zoning Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-17 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-21 11:00AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-21. |
2021-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1206 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1052 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1052 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1052&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1052_.HTM |