HI HB1052 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1052
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Re-referred to EEP, TRN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Re-referred to EEP, TRN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits electric vehicles' (EV) parking fee exemption to four hours. Excludes airports from the EV parking fee exemption. Extends sunset date of Act 168, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, until EVs are 10 percent of registered vehicles in the State. Requires certain places of public accommodation to make reasonable efforts to maintain EV charging stations in working order. Requires new EV charging systems installed pursuant to the EV charging system requirement to be at least Level 2 and network capable. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Re-referred to EEP, TRN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 243-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 01-30-20 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2020-01-23 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-30-20 11:30am. |
2020-01-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-23-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1278 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB1052 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1052 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6