HI HB105 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-25 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-25 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Instructs the department of land and natural resources to employ cooperative resource management strategies in the management and administration of the wildlife and wildlife resources of the State.
Title
Conservation; Cooperative Resource Management
Sponsors
Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-25 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 01-25-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=105&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB105_.HTM |