HI HB1046 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1046
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Downpayment Loan Program to provide greater assistance to low and moderate income first-time homebuyers.
Title
Relating To The Downpayment Loan Assistance Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-16-17 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB912 (Same As) 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
HB1046 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1046 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1046&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1046_.HTM |