HI HB1045 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (H) Act 080, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (H) Act 080, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the Insurance Code to adopt the revisions to the National Association of Insurance Commissioners model laws and regulations for risk-based capital trend test for property and casualty insurers required for accreditation. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB1045 CD1)
Title
Insurance; Risk-Based Capital
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (H) Act 080, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183). | |
2011-06-06 | (S) Act 080, 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183). | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 117). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 117) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-27 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Herkes, Morikawa, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Souki. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 2:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-11 2:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Herkes, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Ito, Souki, Ching. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 538) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1251) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 828) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-11 10:15AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 232). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 902) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-11 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 530), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Carroll, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, Morita, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Ching, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, McKelvey, Souki, Thielen. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-14-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 122), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-04-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1272 (Same As) 2011-03-10 - (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33