HI HB1043 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - Referred to EDU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - Referred to EDU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the department of education's weekly report on schools that have reported positive COVID-19 cases. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 386). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matayoshi voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 808) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-16 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Perruso, Quinlan, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2023-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to EDN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1043 (Carry Over) 2023-03-10 - Referred to EDU, JDC.
SB1341 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to EDU/HHS, JDC.
SB1341 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to EDU/HHS, JDC.