HI HB1038 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends expiration period on the Hawaii State Identification card from six years to eight years; deletes the provisions for transitioning from expiration dates calculated by issue dates to expiration on the cardholder's birthday.
Title
Identification
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB856 (Same As) 2011-01-24 - (S) Referred to CPN, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1038&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB1038_.htm |