HI HB103 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows departments and agencies time to comply with employees' retirement system reporting standards based on when final specifications are provided by the employees' retirement system. Effective 6/30/3000.
Title
Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima, Woodson excused (3). |
2023-02-02 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 15) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-01-31 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 01-31-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB213 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB103 (Carry Over) 2023-02-02 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima, Woodson excused (3).
HB103 (Carry Over) 2023-02-02 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima, Woodson excused (3).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=103&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB103_HD1_.HTM |