HI HB1025 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1025
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Professional and Vocational Licensing Act to reduce the time frame for which an application is considered abandoned from two years to one year and to specify how this one-year period applies to the process for applications for examination.
Title
Relating To The Professional And Vocational Licensing Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1323 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1025 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1025 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1025&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1025_.HTM |