HI HB1024 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1024
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for temporary permits to be issued to registered nurses and licensed practical nurses, and revises the exemptions for license.
Title
Relating To Nurses Licensed In Another Jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1024 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB1322 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1322 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1024&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1024_.HTM |