HI HB1024 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 098, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 098, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the sunset date that exempts county lifeguards from liability for any civil damages resulting from any act or omission within the scope of employment as a county lifeguard. (SD2)
Title
Liability; County Lifeguards
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Act 098, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199). |
2014-06-18 | House | Act 098, on 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199). |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 755). |
2014-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-04-24 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Woodson excused (2). |
2014-04-24 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2014-04-23 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-14. |
2014-04-17 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Rhoads, Brower, Say, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2014-04-15 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:45PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Hee Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hanohano, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Belatti, Brower, Say, Fale Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 514) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3338) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-03-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-01-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2931) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 207). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 765-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-01-30 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-30-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 476), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, C. Lee. |
2013-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:45AM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-06-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |