HI HB1010 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Act 205, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Act 205, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the counties to adopt an ordinance requiring employers to offer employees specified commuter benefits options. (HB1010 CD1)
Title
Commuter Benefits; Counties
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | Act 205, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306). |
2015-07-06 | House | Act 205, on 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Inouye . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 70). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 70) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Nishihara, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Rhoads, Cullen, LoPresti, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 1:15 PM in Conference Room 225. |
2015-04-30 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 11:45AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-15 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Nishihara, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto Co-Chairs; Ruderman. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Rhoads, Cullen Co-Chairs; Har, LoPresti, Tupola. |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 594) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Inouye . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Riviere, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1444) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-06-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TRA/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1108) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Inouye, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Espero, Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA deferred the measure until 03-24-15 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TRA/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRA/JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 260). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 821) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-17 | House | Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 19 |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee excused (1). |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 147), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-09-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |