HI HB1001 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the chapter governing public charter schools to align the requirements for start-up and conversion charter schools. Defines "applicant governing board" and makes conforming amendments. Makes other housekeeping amendments. (HB1001 HD1)
Title
Public Charter Schools; Charter Schools Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 310) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, Kong, LoPresti, Say, Tsuji, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ito, Matsumoto. |
2015-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 02-09-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-27 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB831 (Same As)