GA SR736 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION applying for a convention of the states under Article V of the United States Constitution; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States Constitution Article V; apply for a convention of the states

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-06 - House of Representatives - House Vote #716 (Y: 107 N: 58 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #431 (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-22 Effective Date
2014-04-22 Act 593
2014-04-22SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2014-03-25SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2014-03-06HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2014-03-06HouseHouse Third Readers
2014-03-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2014-02-06HouseHouse Second Readers
2014-02-05HouseHouse First Readers
2014-02-04SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2014-02-04SenateSenate Third Read
2014-01-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2014-01-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2014-01-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2014-01-13SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback