GA SR615 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Property Owners' Associations, Homeowners' Associations, and Condominium Associations Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Property Owners' Associations, Homeowners' Associations, and Condominium Associations Study Committee; create
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |