GA SR503 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate African American History and Culture Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate African American History and Culture Study Committee; create
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |