GA SR369 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Department of Natural Resources to recognize Saturday, September 28, 2019, as National Hunting and Fishing Day in the State of Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Natural Resources; recognize September 28, 2019 as National Hunting and Fishing Day in the state of Georgia; urge
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] |
Sen. Marty Harbin [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |